Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2228 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15634 Week
» 68650 Month
» 188177 Year
» 3215030 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7088 |
m/e |
08/1943 |
War Dept. |
77088 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90554 |
m/e |
03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2290 |
Works Number |
4904 |
To Service |
During 08/1943 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 16/09/1962 |
Service Life |
19 yrs, 1 mth , 16 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
28/02/1954 |
Darlington Works |
North Road Works have completed Class 2 MT 78014/5, and the diesel-electric shunters are now all in traffic, No. 13081 completing the order. Engines for works include 60806/18/37/88, 61010/37/69/84, 61124, 61273, 61418/28, 62381, 62715/20/44, 63437/50/61, 65061, 65676 (to scrap yard), 65743, 65778, 67658/90, 67715/36/9/47/59/89/91, 90089, 90116, 90270/80, 90400/1/31/9, 90554, 90600. |
SLS/195404 |
29/01/1961 |
Market Harborough MPD |
The sub shed of Leicester is supplied with two engines for its two turns viz. Welham shunt (Class 4F) and Ivatt 2-6-2T for Seaton workings; 41321 has been working this latter turn and leaves shed at 7-05 a.m. for Seaton. Locomotives on shed on 29th January were 41321, 43949, 44242/9, 44716, 46445, 48010/36/529/671 an 90554. |
SLS/196103 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1943 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7088 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4904 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77088 |
|
|
03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90554 |
|
|
27/08/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
23/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
22/01/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) |
|
|
07/05/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (40E) |
|
|
16/09/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90554 |
|
|
11/1962 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire |
|
|