Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 750 Today
» 1040 Yesterday
» 1790 Week
» 11960 Month
» 289756 Year
» 1174137 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7088 m/e 08/1943
War Dept. 77088 m/e 01/1945
BR 90554 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Works Number 4904
To Service During 08/1943
Withdrawal Sun 16/09/1962
Scrapping During 11/1962 at Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
Service Life 19 yrs, 1 mth , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
35A New England 4w/e 23/09/1950
40E Langwith Junction 4w/e 22/01/1955
40E Colwick w/e 07/05/1960
   Withdrawn 16/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN MAR March 16/10/1947
ALLOC 35A New England w/e 27/08/1950
ALLOC 35A New England 12/07/1953
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction 4w/e 29/01/1955
ALLOC 40E Colwick 4w/e 14/05/1960
WDN   16/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7088
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4904
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77088    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90554    
23/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to New England (35A)    
22/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
07/05/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
16/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 90554    
11/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire    

prev prev