Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 106 Today
» 1371 Yesterday
» 4066 Week
» 33652 Month
» 407665 Year
» 1629230 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7096 m/e 09/1943
War Dept. 77096 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90560 w/e 11/11/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Order Number 2290
Works Number 4912
To Service During 09/1943
Withdrawal Sat 22/04/1967
Scrapping During 09/1967 at Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw)
Service Life 23 yrs, 7 mths , 22 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1943
64A St Margarets 4w/e 04/10/1952
62C Dunfermline Upper 4w/e 27/11/1954
65F Grangemouth 4w/e 19/01/1963
62C Dunfermline Upper 4w/e 04/12/1965
52G Sunderland 4w/e 31/12/1966
62C Dunfermline Upper 4w/e 25/02/1967
   Withdrawn on 22/04/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN DFU Dunfermline Upper on 18/09/1947
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 4w/e 04/10/1952
ALLOC 62C Dunfermline Upper 4w/e 27/11/1954
ALLOC 65F Grangemouth 7w/e 29/12/1962
ALLOC 62C Dunfermline Upper 3w/e 30/10/1965
ALLOC 52G Sunderland 8w/e 31/12/1966
ALLOC 62C Dunfermline Upper 5w/e 04/02/1967
ALLOC 91X To Scottish Region 8w/e 25/02/1967
WDN   on 22/04/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7096
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4912
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77096    
11/11/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90560    
04/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
27/11/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (62C)    
19/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F)    
04/12/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (62C)    
31/12/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
25/02/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (62C)    
22/04/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 90560    

prev prev