25/09/1947 |
Stratford Works |
The following withdrawn locos. were noted in the vicinity of the stripping shop on 25/9: 'F3' 7118/21/29/38/45; 'B12/3' 1522; 'D16/3' 2500; 'J15' 5358 an 5403 (all stripped), whilst 7125 an 7148 were intact. Other locos. stripped were: 'J15' 5402/54; 'D16' 2535; 'J17' 5541/71. In the stripping shop were: 'E4' 2784; 'J15' 5472; 'J19/2' 4675 and 'J17' 5549. In the Paint shop were the 'Coffee Pot' 'Y5' 8081 and W.D. 77416. A curious sight was the crane tank shed filled by two W.D.'s 77119 an 77312 (the latter with a 15A shed plate). In the fields behind the New Works were 'F3' 7146; 'J70' 8225; 'H2' 7512; 'D16' 2591; 'B12' 1544 and 'J39' 4841, all awaiting works. W.D. 77476 was in the New Works, and W.D.'s 77302 and 77107 were in the shed yard. 'D16' 2584; 'J20' 4677/93; 'J39' 4708/61, 'J69' 8574/8632; 'F6' 7230 and 'F4' 7162 were all noted newly painted ex-works. 7162 was fitted with a tablet-catcher. |
SLS/194711 |
30/04/1950 |
Cowlairs Works |
Locomotives entering Works during April: These included Nos. 60529, 61103/72, 61738/68, 61854, 61909/83, 62423, 2430, 62436, 2475, 62479, 3143, 4544, 64593, 64849/54, 4865/68, 64899, 4917, 65921, 7469, 8458, 8550, 9151/62, 69174, 9182, 69553, 90071, 90306, ex-L.M.S. 2835, 42909/18, ex-W.D. 77087, 77107, 77302/99. |
SLS/195006 |
10/03/1963 |
Goole MPD (Weigh House) |
Stored at Goole on 10th March-60518. |
SLS/196304 |
23/04/1963 |
Doncaster Works (Weigh House) |
New Erecting Shop: E3090-5 no bogies, D5583, D5819, D6744. Works, Shunters : 68928/71/6. Awaiting Works: D203, D2010, D2561, D5510/95, D5602/57, D6707, D8240. Stored in Works Yards : 15004, 60014/39/49/54/76/137/500/17/26/39, 61135, 68925, 69523, 90250/3/70. Crimpsall: 60057/117/21/34/52, 62027/50, 90572/3, Dept. 10, D2008/27, D2567, D2957, D3625/45/63, D5045/70, D5523/42/84/5/609/54, D6709/804, D8205, D8401/9, D9008/19. Stripping Shop: 90043/109/33/602, D5655, D5804. Works Yard: 61348 in steam. Weigh House: 90024/569, D5822. Paint Shop: LNER 4771, 62024, 90036, D1517, D3685, D5050/5/94, D6834/5/6, E3083. |
SLS/196304 |