Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 2627 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16033 Week
» 69049 Month
» 188576 Year
» 3215429 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7111 |
m/e |
10/1943 |
War Dept. |
77111 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90571 |
m/e |
03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2291 |
Works Number |
4927 |
To Service |
During 10/1943 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 18/11/1963 |
Service Life |
20 yrs, 1 mth , 19 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
28/02/1949 |
Vickers Armstrong Works |
Class '8' W.D. 2-8-0's awaiting repair at Vickers-Armstrong's Works during February were:-Nos. 3085, 63141, 77111/52, 77218, 77378, 77401, 79219; while those ex Works during the same period were:-Nos. 70817, 77001, 77115, 77221, 77310, 78542, 79264, 90685 (ex 79224). |
SLS/194904 |
08/07/1962 |
York South MPD |
Stored in the old south shed are 60887/95/939/82 all ex works, 61039, 61240 and 90467/571/8/663, also four BRCW d.m.us. damaged in a collision in March, viz. uE50543/76/9201/22, all noted 8th July. |
SLS/196208 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1943 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7111 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4927 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77111 |
|
|
03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90571 |
|
|
26/03/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) |
|
|
17/09/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (YK) |
|
|
12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) |
|
|
10/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) |
|
|
21/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C) |
|
|
30/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C) |
|
|
15/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
16/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
18/11/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90571 |
|
|
12/1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |
|
|