Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 888 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18691 Week
» 71707 Month
» 191234 Year
» 3218087 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7113 |
m/e |
10/1943 |
War Dept. |
77113 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3107 |
m/e |
03/1947 |
British Railways (1st BR) |
63107 |
w/e |
29/05/1948 |
British Railways |
90428 |
m/e |
10/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2291 |
Works Number |
4929 |
To Service |
During 10/1943 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 02/01/1966 |
Service Life |
22 yrs, 3 mths , 3 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1943 |
COL |
|
Colchester |
w/e |
03/04/1948 |
MAR |
|
March |
w/e |
08/05/1948 |
36A |
|
Doncaster |
w/e |
13/04/1963 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
02/01/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1943 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7113 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4929 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77113 |
|
|
03/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3107 |
|
|
03/04/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (COL) |
|
|
08/05/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MAR) |
|
|
29/05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 63107 |
|
|
10/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90428 |
|
|
13/04/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
02/01/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90428 |
|
|
04/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Drapers: Hull |
|
|