Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 464 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 464 Week
» 17800 Month
» 295596 Year
» 1179977 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7115 m/e 10/1943
War Dept. 77115 m/e 01/1945
BR 90572 m/e 10/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Works Number 4931
To Service During 10/1943
Withdrawal Thu 10/02/1966
Scrapping During 06/1966 at Drapers (Hull)
Service Life 22 yrs, 4 mths , 11 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
84C Banbury 6w/e 30/06/1952
86C Cardiff Canton 2w/e 12/07/1952
81C Southall 4w/e 11/07/1959
86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 08/08/1959
81C Southall 4w/e 06/10/1962
41F Mexborough w/e 08/12/1962
41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) w/e 25/01/1964
41J Langwith Junction w/e 09/10/1965
   Withdrawn 10/02/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN OXY Oxley m/e 31/05/1947
ALLOC CHR Chester West m/e 30/06/1947
ALLOC 84C Banbury 4w/e 14/06/1952
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 12/07/1952
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 08/08/1959
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 02/12/1962
ALLOC 41F Mexborough 2w/e 15/12/1962
ALLOC 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) 9w/e 08/02/1964
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 5w/e 09/10/1965
WDN   10/02/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7115
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4931
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77115    
10/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90572    
30/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Banbury (84C)    
12/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
11/07/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
08/08/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
06/10/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
08/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (41F)    
25/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E)    
09/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
02/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 90572    
06/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev