Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 380 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 380 Week
» 22886 Month
» 326076 Year
» 1547641 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7116 m/e 10/1943
War Dept. 77116 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90573 m/e 09/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Order Number 2291
Works Number 4932
To Service During 10/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sun 15/08/1965
Scrapping During 10/1965 at Garnham, Harris and Elton (Chesterfield)
Service Life 21 yrs, 10 mths , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1943
86E Severn Tunnel Junction 3w/e 17/05/1952
86J Aberdare 4w/e 01/11/1952
81F Oxford 4w/e 21/03/1953
85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 16/05/1953
86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 04/10/1958
81C Southall 4w/e 06/10/1962
36C Frodingham on 02/12/1962
41F Mexborough w/e 26/01/1963
41D Canklow w/e 07/03/1964
41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) w/e 14/03/1964
   Withdrawn w/e 15/08/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN SPM St Philips Marsh m/e 30/11/1946
ALLOC 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) m/e 31/10/1951
ALLOC 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 17/05/1952
ALLOC 86J Aberdare 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 81F Oxford 4w/e 21/03/1953
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 16/05/1953
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 04/10/1958
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region on 02/12/1962
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 2w/e 15/12/1962
ALLOC 41F Mexborough 3w/e 02/02/1963
ALLOC 41D Canklow 4w/e 07/03/1964
ALLOC 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) 2w/e 21/03/1964
WDN   w/e 15/08/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/02/1951 Western Region WD\'s So far as our records show, the number of 8F/2-8-0/WD working on the Western Region has been reduced to 30, as follow: 90148 (83D), 77184 (86A), 77200 (82B), 77203 (85B), 90188 (87K), 90201 (86E), 77247 (82B), 90214 (84K), 90225 (87K), 77326 (82B), 77368 (86A), 77380 (86G), 77408 (85A), 70801 (82C), 70808 (87F), 77288 (86E), 77289 (82B), 90524 (85C), 90529 (81F), 77099 (86G), 77102 (86A), 90572 (84K), 77116 (82B), 90579 (87K), 90630 (82D), 90685 (84E), 79225 (84K), 79232 (85A), 90701 (82D), 90716 (86E). SLS/195104
15/10/1951 Locomotives in the 9xxxx Series Renumbering Most of these engines have now received their 9xxxx numbers, the known exceptions in mid-October being Eastern Region: 90063/96, 90153, 90215/32, 90410. London Midland Region: 90102/5/9/10/13/23/35/73/83/94, 90205/71/95, 90314/26/27/43/52/66, 90413, 90576, 90621/87. North-Eastern Region: 90100, 90309, 90518, 90627/88. Scottish Region: 90293, 90616 (2-8-0), 90760/64/65/70 (2-10-0). Western Region: 90167/76/79, 90238/61/68/84, 90312/15/55/56, 90563/65/73, 90686. Possibly a few of these have been done but not recorded; information concerning such would be welcomed. SLS/195111
10/03/1963 Goole MPD (Crimpsall) Stored at Goole on 10th March-60518. SLS/196304
23/04/1963 Doncaster Works (Crimpsall) New Erecting Shop: E3090-5 no bogies, D5583, D5819, D6744. Works, Shunters : 68928/71/6. Awaiting Works: D203, D2010, D2561, D5510/95, D5602/57, D6707, D8240. Stored in Works Yards : 15004, 60014/39/49/54/76/137/500/17/26/39, 61135, 68925, 69523, 90250/3/70. Crimpsall: 60057/117/21/34/52, 62027/50, 90572/3, Dept. 10, D2008/27, D2567, D2957, D3625/45/63, D5045/70, D5523/42/84/5/609/54, D6709/804, D8205, D8401/9, D9008/19. Stripping Shop: 90043/109/33/602, D5655, D5804. Works Yard: 61348 in steam. Weigh House: 90024/569, D5822. Paint Shop: LNER 4771, 62024, 90036, D1517, D3685, D5050/5/94, D6834/5/6, E3083. SLS/196304

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7116
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4932
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77116    
09/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90573    
17/05/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E)    
01/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdare (86J)    
21/03/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
16/05/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
04/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
06/10/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
02/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
26/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (41F)    
07/03/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Canklow (41D)    
14/03/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E)    
15/08/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90573    

prev prev