Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 68 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17871 Week
» 70887 Month
» 190414 Year
» 3217267 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7118 |
m/e |
10/1943 |
War Dept. |
77118 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90574 |
w/e |
04/11/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2291 |
Works Number |
4934 |
To Service |
During 10/1943 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 15/02/1964 |
Service Life |
20 yrs, 4 mths , 16 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1943 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7118 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4934 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77118 |
|
|
04/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) |
|
|
04/11/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90574 |
|
|
09/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E) |
|
|
23/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E) |
|
|
15/02/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90574 |
|
|
06/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Central Wagon Co.: Wigan |
|
|