Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 560 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14603 Week
» 79557 Month
» 282221 Year
» 3309074 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7120 |
m/e |
10/1943 |
War Dept. |
77120 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90576 |
m/e |
11/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2291 |
Works Number |
4936 |
To Service |
During 10/1943 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 23/03/1963 |
Service Life |
19 yrs, 5 mths , 21 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/08/1948 |
\"Austerity\" Detail alterations |
2-8-0's Nos. 77120, 77174 an 77461 have been noted fitted with Gresley-type snifting valves |
SLS/194810 |
15/10/1951 |
Locomotives in the 9xxxx Series Renumbering |
Most of these engines have now received their 9xxxx numbers, the known exceptions in mid-October being Eastern Region: 90063/96, 90153, 90215/32, 90410. London Midland Region: 90102/5/9/10/13/23/35/73/83/94, 90205/71/95, 90314/26/27/43/52/66, 90413, 90576, 90621/87. North-Eastern Region: 90100, 90309, 90518, 90627/88. Scottish Region: 90293, 90616 (2-8-0), 90760/64/65/70 (2-10-0). Western Region: 90167/76/79, 90238/61/68/84, 90312/15/55/56, 90563/65/73, 90686. Possibly a few of these have been done but not recorded; information concerning such would be welcomed. |
SLS/195111 |
27/12/1958 |
Rugby Works |
42451(26A), 73137(15C), 75052(1E), 90576 (26A), 61853(2F), 64331(2F). |
SLS/195902 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1943 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7120 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4936 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77120 |
|
|
11/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90576 |
|
|
28/11/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
09/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aintree (27B) |
|
|
04/08/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rose Grove (24B) |
|
|
03/1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire |
|
|
23/03/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90576 |
|
|