Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 772 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 772 Week
» 18108 Month
» 295904 Year
» 1180285 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7121 m/e 10/1943
War Dept. 77121 m/e 01/1945
BR 90577 m/e 08/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Works Number 4937
To Service During 10/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sun 02/05/1965
Scrapping During 07/1965 at Drapers (Hull)
Service Life 21 yrs, 7 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
40E Langwith Junction 4w/e 22/01/1955
40E Colwick w/e 07/05/1960
40A Lincoln w/e 03/12/1960
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) w/e 28/09/1963
   Withdrawn w/e 02/05/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN NWE New England 04/03/1947
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction 4w/e 29/01/1955
ALLOC 40E Colwick 4w/e 14/05/1960
ALLOC 40A Lincoln 5w/e 31/12/1960
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 6w/e 05/10/1963
WDN   w/e 02/05/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7121
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4937
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77121    
08/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90577    
22/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
07/05/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
03/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
28/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
05/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90577    
07/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev