Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 444 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 444 Week
» 22950 Month
» 326140 Year
» 1547705 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7123 m/e 10/1943
War Dept. 77123 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90579 m/e 02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Order Number 2291
Works Number 4939
To Service During 10/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sun 21/02/1965
Scrapping During 07/1965 at Arnott Young (Parkgate)
Service Life 21 yrs, 4 mths , 22 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1943
82C Swindon 4w/e 28/02/1951
84C Banbury 3w/e 19/05/1951
86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 13/08/1955
81C Southall 4w/e 06/10/1962
41F Mexborough on 02/12/1962
41D Canklow w/e 07/03/1964
   Withdrawn w/e 21/02/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN NPT Newport (Teeside) m/e 30/04/1947
ALLOC CDF Cardiff Canton m/e 31/07/1947
LOAN 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) m/e 31/03/1950
LOAN 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 22/04/1950
ALLOC 82C Swindon m/e 31/01/1951
ALLOC MC Melton Constable 4w/e 21/04/1951
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region on 02/12/1962
ALLOC 41F Mexborough 2w/e 15/12/1962
ALLOC 41D Canklow 4w/e 07/03/1964
ALLOC 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) 2w/e 21/03/1964
WDN   w/e 21/02/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/05/1947 Wolverhampton Stafford Road Works W.D. locos. which have been repaired at these Works can readily be distinguished from those which have passed through Swindon, as they are painted all black, with red buffer beams and plain lettering. The following are amongst those which have been dealt with here: Nos. 77026, 77053, 77079, 77097, 77106, 77123, 77184, 77202. 77210, 77214, 77241, 77247, 77257, 77289. 77380, 77388, 78522, 78566, 78717 and 79244. SLS/194708
28/02/1951 Western Region WD\'s So far as our records show, the number of 8F/2-8-0/WD working on the Western Region has been reduced to 30, as follow: 90148 (83D), 77184 (86A), 77200 (82B), 77203 (85B), 90188 (87K), 90201 (86E), 77247 (82B), 90214 (84K), 90225 (87K), 77326 (82B), 77368 (86A), 77380 (86G), 77408 (85A), 70801 (82C), 70808 (87F), 77288 (86E), 77289 (82B), 90524 (85C), 90529 (81F), 77099 (86G), 77102 (86A), 90572 (84K), 77116 (82B), 90579 (87K), 90630 (82D), 90685 (84E), 79225 (84K), 79232 (85A), 90701 (82D), 90716 (86E). SLS/195104
05/03/1961 Crewe Works (Erecting Shops) Paint Shop: D90/5, 41247/50/5/7/9/64/82, 45228, 45658, 48686, 48733, L.N.W.R. 1054, and the usual preserved engines. Outside Paint Shop: D86/9/91-3, 44768, 48470. 48693, 49395, 84012. Works Sidings: 42584, 42678, 44665, 44868, 45101/90/8, 45205/64, 45391, 45500/4, 45612, 46101/64, 47271, 47672, 48101/22, 48437, 48628/57, 48734, 49149/73, 49335, 78030/4/64, 90313/43, 92009, 92159. Erecting Shops: D94/100-7, 41203/26, 42086, 42557/67, 42657/86, 44664/91, 44738/73, 44802/22/40, 44917, 45062/95, 45106/13/6/48/85, 45217/38/41/57, 45302/14/39/72/92, 45425/46, 45514, 45629/45/98, 45702/8, 46139/44, 46231, 47008, 48345, 48502, 48659, 49122, 49431, 70042, 71000, 90064, 90110, 90207/92, 90399, 90544/79/84, 92046/69. Outside Erecting Shops: 45000/15, 45533, 46421, 48895, 49328, 49448, 92135. New Erecting Shop: D96-9/108/9. Outside New Erecting Shop: D110. Scrap Road: 40001, 42397, 42438, 43194, 43333, 43562, 49243, with 45511 just cut-up. Leaving Works: 45341, 45613, 48705, 92087. Works Shunters: 12020, 44373/4, 47592, 47618, 51412/46, 52312, 52441/64. SLS/196104
05/07/1964 Derby MPD Awaiting Works: D1688. Ex Works: D1749, D1750, D5282/3/4, D5794, 12031/79. Also on 16C. D2859, 92071/158/81/239, 90579/652. Stored: 44172/333, 45585. SLS/196408

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7123
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4939
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77123    
02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90579    
28/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
19/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Banbury (84C)    
13/08/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
06/10/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
02/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (41F)    
07/03/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Canklow (41D)    
21/02/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90579    

prev prev