Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 1616 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15022 Week
» 68038 Month
» 187565 Year
» 3214418 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7135 |
m/e |
11/1943 |
War Dept. |
77135 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90586 |
m/e |
08/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2291 |
Works Number |
4951 |
To Service |
During 11/1943 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 13/02/1966 |
Service Life |
22 yrs, 3 mths , 13 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1943 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7135 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4951 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77135 |
|
|
15/05/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) |
|
|
08/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90586 |
|
|
11/02/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
21/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C) |
|
|
30/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C) |
|
|
06/12/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
13/02/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90586 |
|
|
06/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Drapers: Hull |
|
|