Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1579 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14985 Week
» 68001 Month
» 187528 Year
» 3214381 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7136 |
m/e |
11/1943 |
War Dept. |
77136 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3110 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
British Railways (1st BR) |
63110 |
w/e |
19/06/1948 |
British Railways |
90431 |
m/e |
06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2291 |
Works Number |
4952 |
To Service |
During 11/1943 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 29/12/1962 |
Service Life |
19 yrs, 1 mth , 28 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
28/02/1954 |
Darlington Works |
North Road Works have completed Class 2 MT 78014/5, and the diesel-electric shunters are now all in traffic, No. 13081 completing the order. Engines for works include 60806/18/37/88, 61010/37/69/84, 61124, 61273, 61418/28, 62381, 62715/20/44, 63437/50/61, 65061, 65676 (to scrap yard), 65743, 65778, 67658/90, 67715/36/9/47/59/89/91, 90089, 90116, 90270/80, 90400/1/31/9, 90554, 90600. |
SLS/195404 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1943 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7136 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4952 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77136 |
|
|
02/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3110 |
|
|
03/04/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (COL) |
|
|
08/05/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MAR) |
|
|
19/06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 63110 |
|
|
24/07/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (COL) |
|
|
06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90431 |
|
|
20/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
24/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
20/08/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) |
|
|
29/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90431 |
|
|
04/1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Arnott Young: Avonmour Ironworks, Bilston |
|
|