Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 133 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17936 Week
» 70952 Month
» 190479 Year
» 3217332 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7146 |
m/e |
12/1943 |
War Dept. |
77146 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3111 |
m/e |
03/1947 |
British Railways (1st BR) |
63111 |
m/e |
Not applied |
British Railways |
90432 |
m/e |
02/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2291 |
Works Number |
4962 |
To Service |
During 12/1943 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 03/10/1965 |
Service Life |
21 yrs, 10 mths , 3 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/12/1946 |
General |
The following Austerity Engines taken into N.E. Area stock on 28/12/46 and now classified O7:- Allocated: Newport: 70800/24/37/47/72, 77276/90, 77357, 77506, 78520/34/70, 78633/56/62/74/87/90, 78718, 79285. Heaton: 70815, 77146, 77298, 78577, 78646/53. Springhead: 70804, 77002, 77110, 77211/54, 77474, 78540. York: 77316, 77486, 78680/91/6/8/9, 79185, 79240/88 |
SLS/194704 |
10/12/1965 |
Doncaster MPD |
Stored: 61085, 61135, 61326, 63738, 90203/59/77, 90349/93, 90432/54/76, 90501/16/28, 90629, 92190. |
SLS/196601 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1943 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7146 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4962 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77146 |
|
|
03/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3111 |
|
|
1948 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 63111 but not taken up |
|
|
02/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90432 |
|
|
13/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
20/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
16/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
23/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B) |
|
|
17/05/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
03/10/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90432 |
|
|
01/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Drapers: Hull |
|
|