Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1400 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14806 Week
» 67822 Month
» 187349 Year
» 3214202 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7148 |
m/e |
12/1943 |
War Dept. |
77148 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90593 |
m/e |
06/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2291 |
Works Number |
4964 |
To Service |
During 12/1943 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 24/07/1966 |
Service Life |
22 yrs, 7 mths , 24 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Sightings
Report Date |
Title |
Location |
Report |
Headcode |
Reference |
30/11/1947 |
WD 2-8-0 disposals by the Ministry of Transport |
|
On G.W. waiting to pass through Swindon Shops. |
|
Statement "A" - List of austerity 2-8-0's in the UK but not yet in service |
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
09/09/1963 |
Thornaby MPD (in store) |
The steam allocation here is now in store viz. 60859/946, 65859/84, 67635/40, 68023/39, 76024, 77001/11/4, 90072/81/406/46/51/593. From 9th September (when West Aukland closed) seven type 3 d/es now work all former West Aukland duties. |
SLS/196310 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1943 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7148 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4964 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77148 |
|
|
06/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90593 |
|
|
24/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (25E) |
|
|
30/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mirfield (25D) |
|
|
07/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mirfield (25D) |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
03/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
30/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) |
|
|
24/07/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90593 |
|
|
10/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton |
|
|