Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1169 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14575 Week
» 67591 Month
» 187118 Year
» 3213971 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7152 |
m/e |
05/1943 |
War Dept. |
77152 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90144 |
m/e |
03/1949 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
MEX |
Mexborough |
on |
14/11/1947 |
ALLOC |
38A |
Colwick |
4w/e |
25/02/1956 |
ALLOC |
31B |
March |
5w/e |
31/03/1956 |
ALLOC |
36A |
Doncaster |
4w/e |
23/03/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
14/12/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
28/02/1949 |
Vickers Armstrong Works |
Class '8' W.D. 2-8-0's awaiting repair at Vickers-Armstrong's Works during February were:-Nos. 3085, 63141, 77111/52, 77218, 77378, 77401, 79219; while those ex Works during the same period were:-Nos. 70817, 77001, 77115, 77221, 77310, 78542, 79264, 90685 (ex 79224). |
SLS/194904 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1943 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7152 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25023 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77152 |
|
|
14/11/1947 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Mexborough (MEX) (On loan from War Department) |
|
|
03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90144 |
|
|
18/02/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
24/03/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
16/03/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
12/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90144 |
|
|
03/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|