Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 632 Today
» 1081 Yesterday
» 2747 Week
» 25253 Month
» 328443 Year
» 1550008 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7162 m/e 06/1943
War Dept. 77162 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90149 m/e 06/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25033
To Service During 06/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sun 23/01/1966
Scrapping During 05/1966 at Drapers (Hull)
Service Life 22 yrs, 7 mths , 23 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1943
84K Chester West 4w/e 31/12/1951
86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 31/01/1952
85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 16/05/1953
86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 04/10/1958
86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 31/10/1959
81C Southall 4w/e 06/10/1962
41F Mexborough on 02/12/1962
41D Canklow w/e 22/02/1964
41J Langwith Junction w/e 19/06/1965
   Withdrawn w/e 23/01/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN EFD Eastfield on 28/04/1948
LOAN 31A St Rollox (Balornock) w/e 11/09/1948
EXLOAN EFD Eastfield on 29/10/1948
LOAN 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 04/11/1951
ALLOC 84K Chester West 4w/e 01/12/1951
LOAN 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 29/12/1951
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 16/05/1953
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 11/07/1953
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 08/08/1953
ALLOC 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 04/10/1958
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 31/10/1959
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region on 02/12/1962
ALLOC 41F Mexborough 2w/e 15/12/1962
ALLOC 41D Canklow 4w/e 07/03/1964
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 2w/e 26/06/1965
WDN   w/e 23/01/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
03/01/1947 Shakespeare Cliff There were 22 'Austerity' 2-8-0's on the sidings west of Shakespeare Cliff Tunnel on 3/1/47. and these included 77078, 77085, 77095, 77162, 77222, 77292, 77300, 77364, 77371, 77390, 77395, 78588, NS4320, NS4342, NS4364, NS4400, and six more, whose numbers could not be read. SLS/194702
19/08/1947 Darlington Works The following newly painted locos. were observed on shed here on 19/8: W.D. Nos. 77129, 77209, 77431, 78514 and 79204, together with 'D49' 2708 THJ. On the same day the following newly painted locos. were seen in the Works' yard: 'D49' 2738; 'Q5' 3287; 'J21' 5108; 'J24' 5604; 'J25' 5689 and ex H. & B. 'N13' 9113; whilst the following were stripped but not marked for scrapping: 'J24' 5636; 'J25' 5648/71/81/99, 5701; 'Q5' 3276/78/83/93. Further locos. also stripped were: 'D49' 2727; 'J26' 5731/60/73/77; 'Ql' 9931; W.D. Nos. 77365 (ex N.S. No. 4364) and 77162 (ex N.S. No. 4482). 'T1' 9919, 9921 and 'J77' 8429 TWD were in the Erecting Shop, whilst the frames for the new Class 'Bl' locos. were laid up to No. 1036. 'A2' 507 was in the Works yard but has since been noted in traffic while 'A2' 511 was in Stooperdale boiler yard. 'Austerity' 2-8-0's Nos. 77080 (ex N.S. No. 4330), 77225, 77306 and 77456 were stored in the Paint Shop with the cab fittings removed. The electric locos. that were previously stored had been removed. The scrap yard contained 'J21' 5053 which was almost completely cut up. The scrapping of 'Cl' No. 2845 had been commenced and outside the Works yard Nos. 2825, 2855 and 2879 were awaiting their doom. Owing to the large number of 'CI's' now being withdrawn it is quite impossible for them all to be broken up at Doncaster and consequently a number of these engines are being dealt with at Darlington. SLS/194710
18/01/1964 Darlington MPD (Ex Works) Stored: 46415/73, 61004/255, 63441, 65852/64/91, 68024, 69020, 90100/249/301/655. Ex Works 73138, 75052/58, 90149. Repair Shops Under Light Repairs: 42477, 62059, 63347, 90011. Visitor on Enthusiast Special: 70000. SLS/196402

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7162
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25033
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77162    
06/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90149    
31/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Chester West (84K)    
31/01/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A)    
16/05/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
04/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A)    
31/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
06/10/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
02/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (41F)    
22/02/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Canklow (41D)    
19/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
23/01/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 90149    

prev prev