Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 609 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18412 Week
» 71428 Month
» 190955 Year
» 3217808 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7163 |
m/e |
06/1943 |
War Dept. |
77163 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90150 |
m/e |
05/1949 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
MEX |
Mexborough |
on |
05/11/1947 |
ALLOC |
38A |
Colwick |
4w/e |
25/02/1956 |
ALLOC |
31B |
March |
5w/e |
31/03/1956 |
ALLOC |
36A |
Doncaster |
5w/e |
07/10/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
16/09/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1943 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7163 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25034 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77163 |
|
|
05/11/1947 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Mexborough (MEX) (On loan from War Department) |
|
|
05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90150 |
|
|
18/02/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
24/03/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
07/10/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
16/09/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90150 |
|
|
12/1962 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|