Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 835 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18638 Week
» 71654 Month
» 191181 Year
» 3218034 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7174 |
m/e |
07/1943 |
War Dept. |
77174 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90159 |
m/e |
04/1951 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
07/1943 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
16/11/1963 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
on |
20/03/1947 |
LOAN |
24B |
Rose Grove |
w/e |
05/02/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
16/11/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/08/1948 |
\"Austerity\" Detail alterations |
2-8-0's Nos. 77120, 77174 an 77461 have been noted fitted with Gresley-type snifting valves |
SLS/194810 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1943 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7174 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25045 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77174 |
|
|
04/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90159 |
|
|
16/11/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90159 |
|
|
07/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Butlers: Otley |
|
|