Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 112 Today
» 925 Yesterday
» 1037 Week
» 18373 Month
» 296169 Year
» 1180550 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7178 m/e 07/1943
War Dept. 77178 m/e 01/1945
BR 90162 m/e 05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Works Number 25049
To Service During 07/1943
Withdrawal Mon 24/02/1964
Scrapping During 05/1964 at T W Ward (Beighton)
Service Life 20 yrs, 7 mths , 25 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
35A New England 5w/e 24/03/1951
38A Colwick 4w/e 25/07/1953
40E Langwith Junction 4w/e 22/01/1955
41D Canklow w/e 20/06/1959
40B Immingham w/e 12/09/1959
41D Canklow w/e 09/01/1960
   Withdrawn 24/02/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN ANN Annesley 30/09/1947
ALLOC CLK Colwick 12/10/1947
ALLOC IMM Immingham w/e 12/06/1948
ALLOC 35A New England m/e 31/03/1951
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction 4w/e 29/01/1955
ALLOC 41D Canklow 4w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 03/10/1959
ALLOC 41D Canklow 4w/e 23/01/1960
WDN   24/02/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7178
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25049
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77178    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90162    
24/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to New England (35A)    
25/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
22/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Canklow (41D)    
12/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
09/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Canklow (41D)    
02/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 90162    
05/1964 Scrapped Broken up by T W Ward: Beighton    

prev prev