Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 62 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 7516 Week
» 10098 Month
» 274731 Year
» 1496296 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7180 m/e 07/1943
War Dept. 77180 m/e 01/1945
BR 90164 m/e 05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25051
To Service During 07/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sun 11/04/1965
Scrapping During 07/1965 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 21 yrs, 9 mths , 12 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 07/1943
27B Aintree 4w/e 17/07/1951
25A Wakefield 4w/e 11/08/1951
27B Aintree 8w/e 19/06/1954
24B Rose Grove w/e 15/09/1962
9G Gorton w/e 11/04/1964
41J Langwith Junction w/e 12/09/1964
   Withdrawn w/e 11/04/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 27B Aintree w/e 23/06/1951
ALLOC 27B Aintree 8w/e 27/06/1951
ALLOC 25A Wakefield w/e 11/08/1951
ALLOC 27B Aintree 4w/e 10/07/1954
ALLOC 24B Rose Grove 5w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 9G Gorton 4w/e 02/05/1964
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 2w/e 12/09/1964
WDN   w/e 11/04/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
19/04/1947 Bricklayers Arms MPD A visit to Bricklayers'. Arms on 19/4 found the usual large selection of types present, including seven W.D. 2-8-0. Of these, 77180 has been painted all-over black, and numbered with S.R. style figures (blocked and shaded in green) on the cab sides, and on the back of the tender. The tender sides are completely blank. SLS/194706
07/03/1949 Brighton Works Engines in shops included Nos. 82 Boxhill, 2023/30/37/39/76/89, 2113, S2343, 2449, 32086, 34001 Exeter, 34003/61, 73790, 77056, 77180, 21C107 Wadebridge. SLS/194904
02/01/1951 Ashford Works New diesels, 15226 running trials, 15227 nearly ready; a large diesel complete in the paint shop. Ex shops: lined black 31770, 31800, 32576; unlined 31719, 32412, 90164; slight repairs 31263, 31543, 32167. In shops: 31027, 1279/94, 31321, 31400/11/92, 31712, 1735, 31771, 31827/37/48/53, 31903, 32434 (2 domes), 32488, 32539/83, 33003/32/36, 90678. Waiting shops: 31160/79, 31511, 31736, 31819, 78597, 90226, 90564. On scrap road: 1231, 31597/8, 31604. SLS/195102
28/02/1951 Southern Region WD\'s There seem to be 32 8F/2-8-0/WD on the Southern Region: 90127 an 77150 (73C), 90164 (73B), 90213 (73C), 90194 an 90216/26/34 (73B), 90247 (75A), 90254 (73H), 90257/67 (70B), 90317/60 (75B), 90389, 78597 (73C), 90408/533/552 (73B), 77090 (73C), 90558 (73B), 90562 (70B), 77101 (73B), 90566 (73C), 90570/604 (70B), 90641 (75B), 90669/71/78/702/18 (73C). The numbers are given in order of their B.R. numbers. Of the remainder, the Scottish Region has 89, the North-Eastern 122, the L.M.R. 197 and the Eastern Region 263; though occasional transfers still take place between the Regions. The Scottish Region also has the 2-10-0 engines (series 90750-90774) except one which is allotted to the C.M.E. at Rugby. SLS/195104

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7180
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25051
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77180    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90164    
17/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
11/08/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (25A)    
19/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
15/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Rose Grove (24B)    
11/04/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (9G)    
12/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
11/04/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90164    

prev prev