Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 186 Today
» 1240 Yesterday
» 2525 Week
» 8659 Month
» 236543 Year
» 1458108 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7181 m/e 07/1943
War Dept. 77181 m/e 01/1945
BR 90165 m/e 05/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Works Number 25052
To Service During 07/1943
Withdrawal Sat 25/04/1964
Scrapping During 01/1965 at W.E.Smiths (Ecclesfield)
Service Life 20 yrs, 9 mths , 26 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 07/1943
36C Frodingham w/e 29/09/1962
41F Mexborough w/e 26/01/1963
36A Doncaster w/e 28/09/1963
   Withdrawn 25/04/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN ANN Annesley 10/09/1947
ALLOC STV Staveley (G.C.) 12/10/1947
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 15/11/1947
ALLOC ANN Annesley w/e 30/10/1948
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 04/12/1948
ALLOC NWE New England w/e 18/06/1949
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 4w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 41F Mexborough 3w/e 02/02/1963
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 6w/e 05/10/1963
WDN   25/04/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
09/07/1947 Brighton Works New 'West Country' Pacifics under construction were 21C164-170. This completes the order. These latter ones have a V-shaped cab-front. Locos. being repaired:-2021, 2039, 2345, 2567, 21C118, 77030, 77037, 77074, 77094, 77098, 77178, 77181, and 77444. The repair of the 'Austerity' locos. is top priority hence the recent lag in 'West Country' construction. L.B. and S.C.R. No. 82 Boxhill (ex 380.S) and 377.S are both in L.B. and S.C.R. livery. 19 'Austerity' 2-8-0's were observed stored in sidings between Dover and Folkstone (16/7). Only Nos. available were 77029, 77393, and 70825. SLS/194709

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7181
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25052
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77181    
05/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90165    
29/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
26/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (41F)    
28/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
25/04/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 90165    

prev prev