Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 135 Today
» 1048 Yesterday
» 2120 Week
» 9304 Month
» 317285 Year
» 1201666 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7182 m/e 07/1943
War Dept. 77182 m/e 01/1945
BR 90166 m/e 08/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Works Number 25053
To Service During 07/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sun 09/05/1965
Scrapping During 08/1965 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 21 yrs, 10 mths , 9 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
38A Colwick 4w/e 18/02/1956
40B Immingham w/e 16/04/1960
36C Frodingham w/e 15/10/1960
   Withdrawn w/e 09/05/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN MEX Mexborough 13/11/1947
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 25/02/1956
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 16/04/1960
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 4w/e 29/10/1960
WDN   w/e 09/05/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7182
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25053
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77182    
08/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90166    
18/02/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
16/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
15/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
05/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90166    
08/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev