Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 603 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18406 Week
» 71422 Month
» 190949 Year
» 3217802 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
9772 |
on |
06/03/1936 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
57xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
293 |
To Service |
Wed 06/03/1936 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 07/01/1959 |
Service Life |
22 yrs, 10 mths , 1 dy |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1959 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
06/03/1936 |
SDN |
|
Swindon |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
07/01/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/01/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/03/1936 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 9772 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Swindon (SDN) |
|
|
07/01/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 9772 |
|
|
02/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|