Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 806 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14212 Week
» 67228 Month
» 186755 Year
» 3213608 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7211 |
m/e |
09/1943 |
War Dept. |
77211 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3012 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
British Railways (1st BR) |
63012 |
w/e |
17/04/1948 |
British Railways |
90012 |
m/e |
03/1950 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/12/1946 |
General |
The following Austerity Engines taken into N.E. Area stock on 28/12/46 and now classified O7:- Allocated: Newport: 70800/24/37/47/72, 77276/90, 77357, 77506, 78520/34/70, 78633/56/62/74/87/90, 78718, 79285. Heaton: 70815, 77146, 77298, 78577, 78646/53. Springhead: 70804, 77002, 77110, 77211/54, 77474, 78540. York: 77316, 77486, 78680/91/6/8/9, 79185, 79240/88 |
SLS/194704 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1943 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7211 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25082 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77211 |
|
|
02/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3012 |
|
|
17/04/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 63012 |
|
|
12/02/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stockton (SKN) |
|
|
03/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90012 |
|
|
20/08/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) |
|
|
20/07/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
21/09/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Normanton (55E) |
|
|
24/02/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90012 |
|
|
04/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |
|
|