Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 136 Today
» 1352 Yesterday
» 7877 Week
» 28319 Month
» 365165 Year
» 1586730 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7222 m/e 09/1943
War Dept. 77222 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90192 m/e 01/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25093
To Service During 09/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sat 04/05/1963
Scrapping During 10/1963 at Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
Service Life 19 yrs, 8 mths , 3 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1943
84C Banbury 4w/e 31/12/1951
86C Cardiff Canton 2w/e 12/07/1952
86G Pontypool Road 4w/e 09/10/1954
6C Birkenhead Mollington Street on 26/02/1961
8D Widnes w/e 15/09/1962
8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 23/03/1963
   Withdrawn w/e 04/05/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN EFD Eastfield on 18/08/1947
LOAN 31A St Rollox (Balornock) w/e 11/09/1948
EXLOAN EFD Eastfield on 29/10/1948
ALLOC 84C Banbury 4w/e 01/12/1951
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 12/07/1952
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 11/07/1953
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 08/08/1953
ALLOC 86G Pontypool Road 4w/e 09/10/1954
TOSTORE   4w/e 09/08/1958
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region m/e 28/02/1961
ALLOC 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 04/03/1961
ALLOC 8D Widnes 5w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 30/03/1963
WDN   w/e 04/05/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/02/1946 W.D. Locomotives The following have been noted at Folkestone recently: 77070/81, 77122/9, 77222, 77402/11/26/84, 77508, 78588. As they carried allocations painted on the cab sides, they have presumably been in traffic on the continent. SLS/194605
28/02/1946 Locomotives Miscellany More W.D. 2-8-0's appear to be allocated to B.A.; many of these engines were lately standing about in the Dover areas. 'Schools' 907 'Dulwich,' 917 'Ardingly,' 934 'St. Lawrence' are light green. 'Demob.' specials are still running frequently from Folkestone, etc., to Guildford via Tonbridge and Redhill, worked to the latter by locos, carrying Dover spare duty Nos, 462-3, but actually the engines are often B.A. or AFD. 4-4-0's. They return light from Redhill it not otherwise required. SLS/194605
28/02/1946 W.D. Locomotives The following have been noted at Folkestone recently: 77070/81, 77122/9, 77222, 77402/11/26/84, 77508, 78588. As they carried allocations painted on the cab sides, they have presumably been in traffic on the continent. SLS/194605
03/01/1947 Shakespeare Cliff There were 22 'Austerity' 2-8-0's on the sidings west of Shakespeare Cliff Tunnel on 3/1/47. and these included 77078, 77085, 77095, 77162, 77222, 77292, 77300, 77364, 77371, 77390, 77395, 78588, NS4320, NS4342, NS4364, NS4400, and six more, whose numbers could not be read. SLS/194702

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7222
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25093
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77222    
01/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90192    
31/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Banbury (84C)    
12/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
09/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G)    
26/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C)    
15/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Widnes (8D)    
23/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
04/05/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 90192    

prev prev