Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 338 Today
» 1084 Yesterday
» 338 Week
» 30628 Month
» 333818 Year
» 1555383 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7223 m/e 10/1943
War Dept. 77223 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3020 m/e 02/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63020 w/e 01/01/1949
British Railways 90020 m/e 09/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25094
To Service During 10/1943
Withdrawal During 06/1967
Scrapping During 09/1967 at Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw)
Service Life 23 yrs, 8 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1943
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 23/02/1952
62A Thornton Junction 4w/e 16/05/1953
   Withdrawn m/e 06/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 23/02/1952
ALLOC 62A Thornton Junction 4w/e 16/05/1953
WDN   2w/e 28/11/1964
WDN   on 04/04/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1946 General The following 2-8-0 Austerity engines were taken in to Scottish Area stock as from 28/12/46 and are now, Class O7:- Allocated: Eastfield: 77223, 77498, 77501. St. Margaret's: 70841, 78527/8, 78625/63/64, 78708/11, 79177. Thornton: 70816/30, 77033, 77360/7, 78655/68, 78702/13. Dundee: 70852, 77277, 77505, 78654, 79251. Ferryhill (Aberdeen): 77423/35/87, 78608/41. SLS/194704
17/05/1947 Eastfield MPD New 'B1' were much in evidence here, Nos. 1191/2 on 17/5, Nos. 1194/5 on 24/5, and Nos. 1193-1197 on 31/5. 'Austerity' 2-8-0 No. 77367 was noted on 17/5, not re-numbered L.N.E. No. 3019 as stated in the Journal. (Officially given by the Co. as re-numbered to 3019 on 2/2/47.-Editor). Further 'Austerity' 2-8-0 noted here during the month ended 31/5 were: Nos. 77078, 77225, 71306, 77456, 77470 and 78568; also '07' Nos. 3020, 3089, and 3120. All appeared to be awaiting shop repair. (K.M.). SLS/194708

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7223
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25094
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77223    
02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3020    
01/01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 63020    
09/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90020    
23/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
16/05/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A)    
06/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 90020    

prev prev