Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 2136 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19939 Week
» 72955 Month
» 192482 Year
» 3219335 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7227 |
m/e |
10/1943 |
War Dept. |
77227 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90195 |
m/e |
06/1949 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
MEX |
Mexborough |
on |
08/11/1947 |
ALLOC |
36A |
Doncaster |
2w/e |
25/08/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
03/10/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
10/10/1965 |
Doncaster Shed (Stored) |
Stationary boiler: 92190. Stored: 61107/96, 61208, 61367, 63593, 63688, 63738, 90085/96/195/235/52/93/349/64/5/454/76/557/687. |
SLS/196511 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1943 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7227 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25098 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77227 |
|
|
08/11/1947 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Mexborough (MEX) (On loan from War Department) |
|
|
06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90195 |
|
|
25/08/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
03/10/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90195 |
|
|
01/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Drapers: Hull |
|
|