Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 29 Online
» 4031 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 22942 Week
» 87896 Month
» 290560 Year
» 3317413 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7233 |
m/e |
10/1943 |
War Dept. |
77233 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3021 |
m/e |
03/1947 |
British Railways (1st BR) |
63021 |
m/e |
Not applied |
British Railways |
90021 |
m/e |
06/1949 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1943 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7233 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25104 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77233 |
|
|
03/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3021 |
|
|
1948 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 63021 but not taken up |
|
|
07/02/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) |
|
|
17/04/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) |
|
|
04/09/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) |
|
|
06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90021 |
|
|
17/09/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (YK) |
|
|
12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) |
|
|
10/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) |
|
|
17/12/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
16/06/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
20/07/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
21/09/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Normanton (55E) |
|
|
12/11/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90021 |
|
|
03/1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire |
|
|