Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 2712 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16118 Week
» 69134 Month
» 188661 Year
» 3215514 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7243 |
m/e |
11/1943 |
War Dept. |
77243 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3027 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
British Railways (1st BR) |
63027 |
m/e |
Not applied |
British Railways |
90027 |
m/e |
06/1950 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1943 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7243 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77243 |
|
|
02/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3027 |
|
|
1948 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 63027 but not taken up |
|
|
14/02/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) |
|
|
17/04/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) |
|
|
04/09/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) |
|
|
13/08/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) |
|
|
06/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90027 |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
27/05/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90027 |
|
|
06/1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |
|
|