Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 579 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18382 Week
» 71398 Month
» 190925 Year
» 3217778 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7250 |
m/e |
11/1943 |
War Dept. |
77250 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3028 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
British Railways (1st BR) |
63028 |
w/e |
03/04/1948 |
British Railways |
90028 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1943 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7250 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77250 |
|
|
02/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3028 |
|
|
03/04/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 63028 |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90028 |
|
|
08/10/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (STR) |
|
|
21/01/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (NWE) |
|
|
19/10/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
18/04/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
07/05/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mexborough (41F) |
|
|
29/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90028 |
|
|
04/1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Arnott Young: Parkgate |
|
|