Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 4176 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17582 Week
» 70598 Month
» 190125 Year
» 3216978 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7251 |
m/e |
11/1943 |
War Dept. |
77251 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3029 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
British Railways (1st BR) |
63029 |
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
British Railways |
90029 |
m/e |
05/1950 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
01/1943 |
COL |
|
Colchester |
w/e |
24/04/1948 |
31B |
|
March |
4w/e |
20/10/1951 |
40B |
|
Immingham |
4w/e |
24/10/1953 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
04/07/1965 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
STOCK |
YK |
York (North) |
on |
08/03/1946 |
ALLOC |
MAR |
March |
on |
29/11/1946 |
ALLOC |
COL |
Colchester |
w/e |
24/04/1948 |
ALLOC |
31B |
March |
w/e |
20/10/1951 |
ALLOC |
40B |
Immingham |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
04/07/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1943 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7251 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77251 |
|
|
02/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3029 |
|
|
24/04/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (COL) |
|
|
02/10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 63029 |
|
|
05/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90029 |
|
|
20/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
24/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
04/07/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90029 |
|
|
11/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Drapers: Hull |
|
|