Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 3250 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16656 Week
» 69672 Month
» 189199 Year
» 3216052 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7252 |
m/e |
11/1943 |
War Dept. |
77252 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90210 |
m/e |
03/1949 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
13/08/1967 |
West Hartlepool MPD |
The following were on West Hartlepool on 13th August: 43015, 62026/41/2/4, 63344/87/94/7, 63407/31/5, 90061/74/6/116/210/30/54/309/39/47/60/434/59/78/92, 90627/77/95, D2068/77/8, D2153, D2205, D3137/9, D3672, D5152/65, D6756/63/6/9. |
SLS/196709 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1943 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7252 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77252 |
|
|
03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90210 |
|
|
04/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
17/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
17/12/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
16/06/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
11/10/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (56E) |
|
|
11/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) |
|
|
10/09/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sunderland (52G) |
|
|
25/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) |
|
|
01/07/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90210 |
|
|
12/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Drapers: Hull |
|
|