Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1743 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19546 Week
» 72562 Month
» 192089 Year
» 3218942 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7253 |
m/e |
11/1943 |
War Dept. |
77253 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90211 |
m/e |
07/1949 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
01/1943 |
41D |
|
Canklow |
w/e |
25/05/1963 |
36A |
|
Doncaster |
w/e |
19/06/1965 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
18/07/1965 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
MEX |
Mexborough |
on |
03/01/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
19/05/1963 |
ALLOC |
36A |
Doncaster |
2w/e |
26/06/1965 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
18/07/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Sightings
Report Date |
Title |
Location |
Report |
Headcode |
Reference |
30/11/1947 |
WD 2-8-0 disposals by the Ministry of Transport |
Harwich Docks |
On hand at Harwich |
|
Statement "A" - List of austerity 2-8-0's in the UK but not yet in service |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1943 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7253 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77253 |
|
|
07/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90211 |
|
|
25/05/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Canklow (41D) |
|
|
19/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
18/07/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90211 |
|
|
10/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T W Ward: Beighton |
|
|