Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 638 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14044 Week
» 67060 Month
» 186587 Year
» 3213440 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7256 |
m/e |
11/1943 |
War Dept. |
77256 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90213 |
m/e |
10/1949 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
HIT |
Hither Green |
5w/e |
04/02/1950 |
ALLOC |
25C |
Goole |
w/e |
11/08/1951 |
ALLOC |
50B |
Hull Dairycoates |
5w/e |
13/06/1964 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
13/02/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
16/11/1948 |
Brighton Works |
In shops for repair: Nos, 32501 an 77359 (ready); 31919 an 32501 (nearly ready); 680S; CC1 (to be 20001); 1899, 2339, 2512, 2563, 32523, 77256; 34064 (lighter green livery). New construction Nos. 34085-90; 36001; boilers and tenders for 'Merchant Navy' Class. |
SLS/194812 |
28/02/1951 |
Southern Region WD\'s |
There seem to be 32 8F/2-8-0/WD on the Southern Region: 90127 an 77150 (73C), 90164 (73B), 90213 (73C), 90194 an 90216/26/34 (73B), 90247 (75A), 90254 (73H), 90257/67 (70B), 90317/60 (75B), 90389, 78597 (73C), 90408/533/552 (73B), 77090 (73C), 90558 (73B), 90562 (70B), 77101 (73B), 90566 (73C), 90570/604 (70B), 90641 (75B), 90669/71/78/702/18 (73C). The numbers are given in order of their B.R. numbers. Of the remainder, the Scottish Region has 89, the North-Eastern 122, the L.M.R. 197 and the Eastern Region 263; though occasional transfers still take place between the Regions. The Scottish Region also has the 2-10-0 engines (series 90750-90774) except one which is allotted to the C.M.E. at Rugby. |
SLS/195104 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1943 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7256 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77256 |
|
|
10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90213 |
|
|
04/02/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (HIT) |
|
|
11/08/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Goole (25C) |
|
|
13/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
|
|
13/02/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90213 |
|
|
06/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Drapers: Hull |
|
|