Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1767 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15173 Week
» 68189 Month
» 187716 Year
» 3214569 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7260 |
m/e |
12/1943 |
War Dept. |
77260 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90217 |
m/e |
09/1949 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1943 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7260 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77260 |
|
|
15/05/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) |
|
|
09/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90217 |
|
|
11/02/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
30/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C) |
|
|
15/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
16/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
21/06/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90217 |
|
|
10/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Ellis Metals: Derwenthaugh Road, Swalwell |
|
|