Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 766 Today
» 1081 Yesterday
» 2881 Week
» 25387 Month
» 328577 Year
» 1550142 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7277 m/e 08/1944
War Dept. 77277 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3077 m/e 02/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63077 w/e 03/07/1948
British Railways 90077 m/e 06/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25148
To Service During 08/1944
Withdrawal Mon 06/05/1963
Scrapping During 07/1963 at Locomotive Works (Inverurie)
Service Life 18 yrs, 9 mths , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1944
65D Dawsholm 8w/e 31/08/1957
66A Polmadie 4w/e 02/08/1958
66E Carstairs 4w/e 08/04/1961
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 01/07/1961
   Withdrawn on 06/05/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 65D Dawsholm 4w/e 10/08/1957
ALLOC 66A Polmadie 4w/e 09/08/1958
ALLOC 66E Carstairs 4w/e 08/04/1961
ALLOC 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 01/07/1961
WDN   on 06/05/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1946 General The following 2-8-0 Austerity engines were taken in to Scottish Area stock as from 28/12/46 and are now, Class O7:- Allocated: Eastfield: 77223, 77498, 77501. St. Margaret's: 70841, 78527/8, 78625/63/64, 78708/11, 79177. Thornton: 70816/30, 77033, 77360/7, 78655/68, 78702/13. Dundee: 70852, 77277, 77505, 78654, 79251. Ferryhill (Aberdeen): 77423/35/87, 78608/41. SLS/194704

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 7277
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25148
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77277    
02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3077    
03/07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 63077    
06/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90077    
31/08/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D)    
02/08/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
08/04/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Carstairs (66E)    
01/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
06/05/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 90077    

prev prev