|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
26/04/1964 | Derby Shed (On Shed) | On Shed: 45334 x Wok - Cw, D1730, D1732, 12088, 12095, D3022, D4132, D5265 ex works; On Shed: D1735 undercoat, 42161, 42181, 44042, 44134, 44243, 44909, 45002, 45186, 45253, 47320, 47447, 47461, 48199, 48208, 48391, 48490, 48541, 73139, 78057, 90136, 90078, 90357, 90529, 92022, 60876, 68079. | SLS/196406 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1944 | To Service | To service as WD Number 7279 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25150 |
||
01/1945 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 77279 | ||
02/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3078 | ||
14/08/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 63078 | ||
12/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
19/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
09/1950 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 90078 | ||
08/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) | ||
22/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) | ||
16/09/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
05/11/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (52G) | ||
27/11/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 90078 | ||
07/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by W Willoughby: Choppington |