Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 96 Today
» 1371 Yesterday
» 4056 Week
» 33642 Month
» 407655 Year
» 1629220 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7279 m/e 08/1944
War Dept. 77279 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3078 m/e 02/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63078 w/e 14/08/1948
British Railways 90078 m/e 09/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25150
To Service During 08/1944
Withdrawal Sun 27/11/1966
Scrapping During 07/1967 at W Willoughby (Choppington)
Service Life 22 yrs, 3 mths , 27 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1944
53A Hull Dairycoates 5w/e 22/09/1951
50A York (North) w/e 16/09/1961
52G Sunderland 4w/e 05/11/1966
   Withdrawn on 27/11/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN MAR March on 23/11/1945
NEW HTN Heaton on 15/07/1947
ALLOC MAR March on 15/07/1947
ALLOC YK York (North) w/e 12/02/1949
ALLOC DAR Darlington w/e 19/02/1949
ALLOC 53A Hull Dairycoates w/e 08/09/1951
ALLOC 50A York (North) 3w/e 30/09/1961
ALLOC 52G Sunderland 4w/e 05/11/1966
WDN   on 27/11/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
26/04/1964 Derby Shed (On Shed) On Shed: 45334 x Wok - Cw, D1730, D1732, 12088, 12095, D3022, D4132, D5265 ex works; On Shed: D1735 undercoat, 42161, 42181, 44042, 44134, 44243, 44909, 45002, 45186, 45253, 47320, 47447, 47461, 48199, 48208, 48391, 48490, 48541, 73139, 78057, 90136, 90078, 90357, 90529, 92022, 60876, 68079. SLS/196406

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 7279
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25150
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77279    
02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3078    
14/08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 63078    
09/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90078    
22/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
16/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
05/11/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
27/11/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 90078    

prev prev