Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 113 Today
» 1371 Yesterday
» 4073 Week
» 33659 Month
» 407672 Year
» 1629237 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7297 m/e 09/1944
War Dept. 77297 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90361 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24968
To Service During 09/1944
Withdrawal Mon 24/04/1967
Scrapping During 08/1967 at Drapers (Hull)
Service Life 22 yrs, 7 mths , 24 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1944
25A Wakefield (Reinstated) (Ex store on WR) w/e 18/06/1949
91M To London Midland Region 4w/e 30/06/1949
56B Ardsley w/e 18/06/1960
56A Wakefield 4w/e 11/09/1965
52G Sunderland 4w/e 31/12/1966
   Withdrawn on 24/04/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 91W To Western Region / GWR m/e 31/03/1947
ALLOC BAN Banbury m/e 31/07/1947
LOAN 25A Wakefield on 14/06/1949
ALLOC 56B Ardsley 3w/e 02/07/1960
ALLOC 56A Wakefield 4w/e 11/09/1965
ALLOC 52G Sunderland 8w/e 31/12/1966
WDN   on 24/04/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
19/09/1964 Darlington MPD (Shed) On shed-diesel bays: D5170/2, dead line: 69020, 90444/9; Roundhouse: D3228, D2706/31/2, D2318/36/40, D3229, DEPT87, 68011/37/43/7/50/3/60. Shed: 60024 ex works, 60036/45/808/84/5, 62001, 62002 ex works, 62003/43/4/8/64; 61030, 62368, 68010/4/46,151/4, 90011/4/98, 90361/556 ex works, 90688, 42405/77, 43050/6/7, 43102/29/40 and 63460 awaiting move to Stratford. SLS/196410

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 7297
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24968
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77297    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90361    
18/06/1949 Reinstated Reinstated to Wakefield (25A)    
30/06/1949 Allocation Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M)    
18/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (56B)    
11/09/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
31/12/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
24/04/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 90361    

prev prev