Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1947 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19750 Week
» 72766 Month
» 192293 Year
» 3219146 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7300 |
m/e |
03/1943 |
War Dept. |
77300 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3003 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
British Railways (1st BR) |
63003 |
w/e |
30/10/1948 |
British Railways |
90003 |
m/e |
12/1949 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
03/01/1947 |
Shakespeare Cliff |
There were 22 'Austerity' 2-8-0's on the sidings west of Shakespeare Cliff Tunnel on 3/1/47. and these included 77078, 77085, 77095, 77162, 77222, 77292, 77300, 77364, 77371, 77390, 77395, 78588, NS4320, NS4342, NS4364, NS4400, and six more, whose numbers could not be read. |
SLS/194702 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1943 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7300 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24990 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77300 |
|
|
02/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3003 |
|
|
30/10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 63003 |
|
|
12/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90003 |
|
|
24/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
22/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) |
|
|
02/12/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
09/03/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) |
|
|
25/06/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90003 |
|
|
08/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T W Ward: Beighton |
|
|