Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 237 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 237 Week
» 17573 Month
» 295369 Year
» 1179750 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7300 m/e 03/1943
War Dept. 77300 m/e 01/1945
LNER (1946) 3003 m/e 02/1947
BR (1st BR) 63003 w/e 30/10/1948
BR 90003 m/e 12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Works Number 24990
To Service During 03/1943
Withdrawal Thu 25/06/1964
Scrapping During 08/1964 at T W Ward (Beighton)
Service Life 21 yrs, 3 mths , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
40B Immingham 4w/e 24/10/1953
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) w/e 22/07/1961
36A Doncaster w/e 02/12/1961
41J Langwith Junction w/e 09/03/1963
   Withdrawn 25/06/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 4w/e 05/08/1961
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 5w/e 09/12/1961
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 5w/e 06/04/1963
WDN   25/06/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7300
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24990
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77300    
12/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90003    
24/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
22/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
02/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
09/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
06/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 90003    
08/1964 Scrapped Broken up by T W Ward: Beighton    

prev prev