Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1833 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19636 Week
» 72652 Month
» 192179 Year
» 3219032 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7303 |
m/e |
04/1943 |
War Dept. |
77303 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90220 |
w/e |
16/12/1950 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1943 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7303 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25173 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77303 |
|
|
16/12/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90220 |
|
|
03/11/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
22/03/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
19/04/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
19/06/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) |
|
|
25/05/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Canklow (41D) |
|
|
19/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E) |
|
|
09/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) |
|
|
14/11/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90220 |
|
|
03/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Drapers: Hull |
|
|