Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 168 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17971 Week
» 70987 Month
» 190514 Year
» 3217367 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7309 |
m/e |
05/1943 |
War Dept. |
77309 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90224 |
w/e |
25/11/1950 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1943 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7309 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25189 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77309 |
|
|
25/11/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90224 |
|
|
24/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
22/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) |
|
|
02/12/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
09/03/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) |
|
|
24/03/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90224 |
|
|
07/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T W Ward: Killamarsh |
|
|