Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 3875 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17281 Week
» 70297 Month
» 189824 Year
» 3216677 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7312 |
m/e |
05/1943 |
War Dept. |
77312 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90227 |
m/e |
09/1950 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
25/09/1947 |
Stratford Works |
The following withdrawn locos. were noted in the vicinity of the stripping shop on 25/9: 'F3' 7118/21/29/38/45; 'B12/3' 1522; 'D16/3' 2500; 'J15' 5358 an 5403 (all stripped), whilst 7125 an 7148 were intact. Other locos. stripped were: 'J15' 5402/54; 'D16' 2535; 'J17' 5541/71. In the stripping shop were: 'E4' 2784; 'J15' 5472; 'J19/2' 4675 and 'J17' 5549. In the Paint shop were the 'Coffee Pot' 'Y5' 8081 and W.D. 77416. A curious sight was the crane tank shed filled by two W.D.'s 77119 an 77312 (the latter with a 15A shed plate). In the fields behind the New Works were 'F3' 7146; 'J70' 8225; 'H2' 7512; 'D16' 2591; 'B12' 1544 and 'J39' 4841, all awaiting works. W.D. 77476 was in the New Works, and W.D.'s 77302 and 77107 were in the shed yard. 'D16' 2584; 'J20' 4677/93; 'J39' 4708/61, 'J69' 8574/8632; 'F6' 7230 and 'F4' 7162 were all noted newly painted ex-works. 7162 was fitted with a tablet-catcher. |
SLS/194711 |
15/11/1947 |
Eastfield MPD |
On 15/11 No. 1255 was observed here with the wrong Maker's Plate (26157/47), while on 23/11 No. 1256 was seen with the same plates: Nos. 1255 and 1258 were both without plates on 23/11. On 7/12 No. 1067 KIT, which had been repainted green, was seen at Cowlairs West Junction being hauled from Cowlairs Works to Eastfield by 'J.83' No. 8475. On 17/12 No. 1244 Strang Steel HAY was here, being ex Cowlairs Works that day, after having had the nameplates fitted. This is believed to be the first Scottish Area 'B.1' to receive nameplates. On 1/1 No. 1243 EFD was noted here fitted with nameplates-Sir Harold Mitchell. The size of the letters appears to be smaller than that previously used, being between 21' and 3' high. Perhaps the most interesting 'foreigners' on the shed here on the same day were: Nos. 3041 ABD, 3137 HTN and 3190 TWD, the latter carrying both TWD and HTN on the buffer-beam. Nos. 77312 STM and 77313 THJ have been noted here recently, both carrying L.M.S. 15A shed plates, as well as their L.N.E. sheds stencilled or painted on the buffer-beam. Both these engines were regular visitors to Glasgow during the war-but on the L.M.S.-when working from 12A. It is very rare for N.E. Area Class '0.7's' or W.D.'s to appear at Eastfield. |
SLS/194802 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1943 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7312 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25177 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77312 |
|
|
09/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90227 |
|
|
31/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C) |
|
|
27/02/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B) |
|
|
25/07/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Widnes (8D) |
|
|
15/08/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B) |
|
|
28/04/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C) |
|
|
22/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
16/03/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bury (26D) |
|
|
18/05/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bolton (26C) |
|
|
12/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H) |
|
|
19/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E) |
|
|
26/09/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90227 |
|
|
02/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|