|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
01/11/1948 | Darlington Works | The new Class 'A.1' locomotives, Nos. 60130-33, ex North Road bear Works Nos. 2049-52, in order. A minor change will be noticed in the new Darlington and Doncaster Works plates on the new 'A.1's,' they give the date, Works No. and origin, but no area is given. No. 68051 has been fitted with a modified bunker (and new cab windows), for increased coal capacity. Locomotives awaiting Works:-Nos. 827, 1601/29/30/42/51/55/72, 2992 (to scrap yard), 3007, 3344, 4916, 5710, 7307, 8089, 8400, 8686, 9099, 9392, 69841, 'Austerity' 77329 and Electric 26500. Locomotives ex Works:-Nos. 60507, 60980. 62366, 62711/23/75, 63398, 65028, 65118, 65752/85, 65803/83, 67256/65, 68051, 68395, 68437, 68533, 68675, 69372/92, 69787, 69882/91/93 and- 'Austerity' 77215. Locomotives broken up:-Nos. 1360/78, 5641, 8285, 8400 an 9399. It will be noticed that two of these were ex G.C.R. 'B.7' 4-6-0's. It is pleasing to note that the N.E. Area locomotives. especially Gateshead stock, are approaching their pre-grouping splendour for cleanliness. Some of the 'A.4's' are spotless, while the rest are creditable. |
SLS/194812 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1943 | To Service | To service as WD Number 7318 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25183 |
||
01/1945 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 77318 | ||
02/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3007 | ||
04/09/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
30/10/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 63007 | ||
09/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 90007 | ||
11/02/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C) | ||
24/09/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) | ||
21/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) | ||
16/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) | ||
23/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B) | ||
17/05/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
13/12/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E) | ||
17/01/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
21/01/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D) | ||
06/02/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) | ||
11/07/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 90007 | ||
02/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cox and Danks: Wadsley Bridge |