Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 1017 Today
» 1293 Yesterday
» 7224 Week
» 4737 Month
» 232621 Year
» 1454186 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7319 m/e 05/1943
War Dept. 77319 m/e 01/1945
BR 90232 m/e 11/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Works Number 25184
To Service During 05/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sun 02/01/1966
Scrapping During 04/1966 at Drapers (Hull)
Service Life 22 yrs, 8 mths , 3 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1943
36C Frodingham 4w/e 25/07/1953
   Withdrawn w/e 02/01/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN MEX Mexborough 28/10/1947
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 4w/e 18/04/1953
WDN   w/e 12/10/1964
WDN   w/e 02/01/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
15/10/1951 Locomotives in the 9xxxx Series Renumbering Most of these engines have now received their 9xxxx numbers, the known exceptions in mid-October being Eastern Region: 90063/96, 90153, 90215/32, 90410. London Midland Region: 90102/5/9/10/13/23/35/73/83/94, 90205/71/95, 90314/26/27/43/52/66, 90413, 90576, 90621/87. North-Eastern Region: 90100, 90309, 90518, 90627/88. Scottish Region: 90293, 90616 (2-8-0), 90760/64/65/70 (2-10-0). Western Region: 90167/76/79, 90238/61/68/84, 90312/15/55/56, 90563/65/73, 90686. Possibly a few of these have been done but not recorded; information concerning such would be welcomed. SLS/195111

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7319
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25184
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77319    
11/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90232    
25/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
02/01/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 90232    

prev prev