Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 326 Today
» 950 Yesterday
» 326 Week
» 7510 Month
» 315491 Year
» 1199872 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7323 m/e 06/1943
War Dept. 77323 m/e 01/1945
BR 90235 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Works Number 25193
To Service During 06/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sun 03/10/1965
Scrapping During 01/1966 at Drapers (Hull)
Service Life 22 yrs, 4 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
53A Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 20/10/1951
6B Mold Junction 4w/e 23/02/1952
38A Colwick 4w/e 17/05/1952
36A Doncaster w/e 22/10/1960
   Withdrawn w/e 03/10/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
STOCK CLK Colwick 20/02/1947
ALLOC BRN Barnsley 27/04/1947
ALLOC LA Laira m/e 31/08/1947
ALLOC NEV Neville Hill 05/10/1947
ALLOC YK York (North) w/e 13/08/1949
ALLOC 53A Hull Dairycoates w/e 13/10/1951
ALLOC 8B Warrington Dallam w/e 16/02/1952
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 17/05/1952
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 17/05/1952
ALLOC 38A Colwick 12/07/1953
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 29/10/1960
WDN   w/e 03/10/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7323
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25193
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77323    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90235    
20/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
23/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B)    
17/05/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
22/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
10/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90235    
01/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev