Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 30 Online
» 2413 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15819 Week
» 68835 Month
» 188362 Year
» 3215215 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7327 |
m/e |
06/1943 |
War Dept. |
77327 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90239 |
m/e |
05/1951 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
06/1943 |
NWE |
|
New England |
w/e |
12/11/1949 |
36C |
|
Frodingham |
w/e |
29/09/1962 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
25/11/1963 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
STOCK |
HTN |
Heaton |
on |
11/04/1947 |
ALLOC |
MAR |
March |
on |
15/07/1947 |
ALLOC |
NWE |
New England |
w/e |
12/11/1949 |
ALLOC |
36C |
Frodingham |
4w/e |
06/10/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
25/11/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1943 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7327 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25197 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77327 |
|
|
12/11/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (NWE) |
|
|
05/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90239 |
|
|
29/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) |
|
|
25/11/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90239 |
|
|
01/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|